This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/10/2023 at 00:11:52 (UTC).

THE MOLD MAN INC AAO JUAN FERNANDO FLORES GONZALEZ vs. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 THE MOLD MAN INC AAO JUAN FERNANDO FLORES GONZALEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN B FLYNN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN B FLYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE MOLD MAN INC AAO JUAN FERNANDO FLORES GONZALEZ

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEADMAN ANDREW A

800 East Broward Blvd Ste 510

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

DROLESKI AMANDA

Po Box 26349

Tampa, FL 26349

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/16/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

12/05/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/16/2022: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ORDER ON WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING STATUS HEARING

12/21/2022: ORDER ON WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING STATUS HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/22/2023; Court Time: 1:45 PM; Location: BARTOW HRG RM 7B2 RED ELEVATOR; Motion: MOTN - MOTION; Section: M2; Judge: JOHN B FLYNN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR CASE STATUS HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketReason: MOTN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 03/22/2023 01:45 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFFS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING STATUS HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialDate: 11/17/2022; Amount: 185.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9394584

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 01/03/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less