This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 01/10/2023 at 21:26:23 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF RONALD R RANDALL vs. BARTOW REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 THE ESTATE OF RONALD R RANDALL filed an Other lawsuit against BARTOW REHABILITATION CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00LK

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ESTATE OF RONALD R RANDALL

Defendants

BARTOW REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

CHR BARTOW LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOZIOL CARLY A

Defendant Attorney

CHANDLER CORY L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

02/11/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - BARTOW REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

02/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - BARTOW REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - HEATHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

02/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - HEATHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

02/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

02/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - CHR BARTOW LLC

02/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - CHR BARTOW LLC

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID

02/11/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, HEARTHSTONE SENIOR

02/11/2022: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, HEARTHSTONE SENIOR

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

02/11/2022: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID HEALTH

02/11/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID HEALTH

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT CHR BARTOW LLC

02/11/2022: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT CHR BARTOW LLC

PLAINTIFF'S ELECTRONIC MAIL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT CHR BARTOW LLC

02/11/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ELECTRONIC MAIL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT CHR BARTOW LLC

PLAINTIFF'S INSURANCE REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CHR BARTOW LLC

02/11/2022: PLAINTIFF'S INSURANCE REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CHR BARTOW LLC

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CHR BARTOW LLC

02/11/2022: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CHR BARTOW LLC

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT BARTOW REHABILITATION CENTER LLC REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT BARTOW REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF RECORD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS CHR BARTOW LLC NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS CHR BARTOW LLC NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS CHR BARTOW LLC RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS INSURANCE REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS CHR BARTOW LLC RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS ELECTRONIC MAIL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CHR BARTOW LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketMANAGEMENT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID HEALTH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketMANAGMENT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA BRIGID HEALTH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, BARTOW REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketHEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less