This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/10/2023 at 05:51:46 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF CLARENCE BARNETT JR vs. BRUNDIDGE CHRISTEN E

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 THE ESTATE OF CLARENCE BARNETT JR filed an Other lawsuit against BRUNDIDGE CHRISTEN E. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ESTATE OF CLARENCE BARNETT JR BY AND THROUGH CHRISTEN E BRUNDIDGE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

Defendants

GROVES REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC (AS TO GROVES CENTER)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DWYER RYAN G

Defendant Attorney

OVER KRISTEN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - GROVES REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

11/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - GROVES REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

11/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

11/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

11/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLCS NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT GROVES REHABILITATION CENTER LLCS NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT GROVES REHABILITATION CENTER LLCS MEDICARE REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT GROVES REHABILITATION CENTER LLC FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT GROVES REHABILITATION CENTER LLCS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT GROVES REHABILITATION CENTER LLCS NOTICE OF SERVING MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketTO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT GROVES REHABILITATION CENTER LLCS NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S INSURANCE REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S INSURANCE REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, AIRMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less