This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 04/08/2023 at 22:09:34 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY vs. FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON

Case Summary

On 02/07/2023 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN B FLYNN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN B FLYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON A FLORIDA LLC

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANLEY CATHARINE D

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON A FLORIDA LLC

02/09/2023: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON A FLORIDA LLC

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

02/09/2023: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 03/07/2023 11:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DispositionParty: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION; Disposition Code: DSBH; Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Date: 03/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DispositionParty: FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON A FLORIDA LLC; Disposition Code: DSBH; Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Date: 03/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON A FLORIDA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON A FLORIDA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • FinancialDate: 02/08/2023; Amount: 320.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9491990

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 03/07/2023 11:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketHIDAY & RICKE PA'S DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketSTATE FARM'S COMPLAINT FOR COMMERCIAL RIGHT OF REIMBURSEMENT PURSUANT TO FLA STAT 627.7405

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less