This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 04/15/2023 at 22:08:54 (UTC).

SINGLETERRY MARY vs. SENIOR HEALTH - WINTER HAVEN LLC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 SINGLETERRY MARY filed an Other lawsuit against SENIOR HEALTH - WINTER HAVEN LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P MCDANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL P MCDANIEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINGLETERRY, MARY

Defendants

SENIOR HEALTH - WINTER HAVEN LLC

SENIOR HEALTH SOUTH - EX LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA BRIGID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

MICHAEL JAMES DESMOND (AS TO WINTER HAVEN HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOTH RAINEY C

Defendant Attorney

RICH MCMANUS KAREN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/14/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS ARBITRATION REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ARBITRATION INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS ARBITRATION REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS PRELIMINARY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPLE ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialDate: 02/15/2023; Amount: 450.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9500038

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ MICHAEL JAMES DESMOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA BRIGID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ SENIOR HEALTH SOUTH - EX, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ SENIOR HEALTH- WINTER HAVEN, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less