This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 21:27:59 (UTC).

SHATTUCK BRADLEY vs. SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 SHATTUCK BRADLEY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN L SELPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN L SELPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHATTUCK, CHRISTINE

SHATTUCK, BRADLEY

Defendant

SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY

10/08/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

10/03/2018: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • DispositionParty: SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 12/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketCOMPANY BY SERVING TONY A LOUGHMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • FinancialDate: 10/08/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MARK NATION; Receipt Number: 7742054

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less