This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 05/21/2022 at 22:07:28 (UTC).

SCHONBRUN HARVEY vs. GARCIA LAMAR PROPERTIES LLC

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 SCHONBRUN HARVEY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GARCIA LAMAR PROPERTIES LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHONBRUN HARVEY TRUSTEE

Defendants

GARCIA LAMAR PROPERTIES LLC

1214 W 77 St

Hialeah, FL 33014

UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION

Winter Haven, FL 33881

CITY OF WINTER HAVEN

451 Third Street Northwest

Winter Haven, FL 33881

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHONBRUN HARVEY A

1802 N Morgan Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

MURPHY FREDERICK J JR

245 S Central Ave

Bartow, FL 33830

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

03/22/2022: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

03/22/2022: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • FinancialDate: 05/05/2022; Amount: 10.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9147463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DispositionParty: CITY OF WINTER HAVEN; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DispositionParty: GARCIA LAMAR PROPERTIES LLC; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ESERVICE ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2 516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF WINTER HAVEN TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-GARCIA LAMAR PROPERTIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-CITY OF WINTER HAVEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF WINTER HAVEN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHONBRUN , HARVEY A