This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 22:32:28 (UTC).

SANCHEZ OLIVERAS YANEIDA vs. BURGA ANTONIO R

Case Summary

On 07/25/2018 SANCHEZ OLIVERAS YANEIDA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BURGA ANTONIO R. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ OLIVERAS YANEIDA

Defendant

BURGA ANTONIO R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketREPORT OF MAGISTRATE & NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS COMPLETION- ANTONIO BURGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FINANCIAL- NTONIO RICARDO BURGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketReason: FH_DOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 04/30/2019 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketREPORT OF THE MAGISTRATE FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FINANCIAL - YANEIDA SANCHEZ OLIVERAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCLERK'S DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less