This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 16:40:35 (UTC).

ROYALL, KENNETH CLAIBORNE J

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 ROYALL, KENNETH CLAIBORNE J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

ROYALL, JERE Z

CANAVAN, JULIA BRYAN ROYAL

CANAVAN, JULIA BRYAN ROYALL CO-TRUSTEE

ROYALL, JERE Z CO-TRUSTEE

ROYALL, KENNETH C 3 CO-TRUSTEE

Decedent

ROYALL, KENNETH CLAIBORNE J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE-CLOSES FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketWAIVER ACCT./SERVICE PET.DISCH./CONSENT/RECEIPT - KENNETH C. ROYAL III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketWAIVER ACCT./SERVICE PET.DISCH./CONSENT/RECEIPT - JERE Z. ROYALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketWAIVER ACCT./SERVICE PET.DISCH./CONSENT/RECEIPT - JULIA BRYAN ROYALL CANAVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketPROOF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketPROOF SERVICE NOTICE OF ADMIN ATT/RECEIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE / CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketAUTH. TRANSCRIPT DOMICILIARY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketOATH CO-PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE - KENNETH C. ROYALL, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketOATH CO-PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE - JERE Z. ROYALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketOATH CO-PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE - JULIA CANAVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less