This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 00:14:09 (UTC).

ROLLINS, ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 02/19/2018 ROLLINS, ELIZABETH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

BENFIELD, CAROL

ROLLINS, ROBERT LOUIS

ROLLINS, STEVEN RICHARD

Decedent

ROLLINS, ELIZABETH J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION-CLOSES SUMADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketREFUND FROM CLERK - RECEIPT FOR $110.00 REFUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketREFUND FROM CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - SYNCHRONY BANK HOME DESIGN HVAC - C/O DCM SERVICES - $1,961.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketLETTER/MEMO - DCM SERVICES/ CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketCONSENT/WAIVER OF NOTICE OF PETITION OF ADMINISTRATION- ROBERT ROLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM- ASCENSIONPOINT RECOCERY SERVICES HOME DEPOT $2,111.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketCONSENT/WAIVER SERVICE OF PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION- STEVEN ROLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE/ CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketPETITION DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketPETITION SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION-OPENS SUMADM

    Read MoreRead Less