This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 11/20/2022 at 22:05:54 (UTC).

RODRIGO PARRA vs. TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 RODRIGO PARRA filed an Other lawsuit against TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN M KOHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN M KOHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGO PARRA

Defendant

TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOUIS PIERRE A

290 Nw 165Th St Ste M-500

Miami, FL 33169

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/16/2023; Court Time: 9:30 AM; Location: GENERAL CIVIL VIRTUAL; Motion: CMC - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Section: M0; Judge: KEVIN M KOHL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketReason: CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 03/16/2023 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • FinancialDate: 09/23/2022; Amount: 310.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9332831

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill Preferred Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOUIS , PIERRE A