This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 23:16:59 (UTC).

ROBERSON LAURA RENEE vs. MCCONNELL ROBERT KENNETH

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 ROBERSON LAURA RENEE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against MCCONNELL ROBERT KENNETH. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERSON LAURA RENEE

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Defendant

MCCONNELL ROBERT KENNETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED PAYMENT HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketORDER INCOME DEDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketFLORIDA ADDENDUM TO INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketFINAL ORDER ON CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED / ROBERT MCCONNELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED / ROBERT KENNETH MCCONNELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less