This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 21:36:15 (UTC).

RETAILFIRST INSURANCE COMPANY vs. CORIA CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 RETAILFIRST INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CORIA CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RETAILFIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

CORIA CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC

C/O Benito Esquivel Coria, Registered Agent, 306 15Th Street N.E.

Ruskin, FL 33570

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

03/23/2018: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • DispositionParty: CORIA CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC; Disposition Code: DFLT; Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Date: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • HearingCourt Date: 07/18/2018; Court Time: 2:15 PM; Location: BARTOW HRG RM 8B1 RED ELEVATOR; Motion: MOT_FINAL_JUDG - MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGEMENT; Section: 11; Judge: WAYNE DURDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketReason: MOT_FINAL_JUDG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 07/18/2018 02:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT - CORIA CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-CORIA CONTRUCTION GROUP LLC BY SERVING BENITO ESQUIVAL CORIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • FinancialDate: 03/26/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: DALE G. JACOBS; Receipt Number: 7534092

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-CORIA CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less