This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 20:29:30 (UTC).

RAJARATNAM MURUGAN vs. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 RAJARATNAM MURUGAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD P HILL II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GERALD P HILL II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAJARATNAM MURUGAN

Winter Haven, FL 33884

RAJARATNAM YOSHANA

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON TRAVIS

17862 Hunting Bow Circle, Suite 102

Lutz, FL 33558

Defendant Attorney

GUTTERMAN MARC J

200 East Broward Blvd Suite 1630

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

01/21/2020: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE FOR TRIAL

09/05/2019: NOTICE FOR TRIAL

PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/05/2019: PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANTS ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

01/14/2019: DEFENDANTS ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

11/20/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

11/09/2018: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/09/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF DEATH - YOSHANA RAJARATNAM DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY RULE 1.720(E)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANTS CERTFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS UNDER RULE 1 351

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY RESPONSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY RESPONSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - RECEIVED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO PLAINTIFF MURUGAN RAJARATNAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • FinancialDate: 11/20/2018; Amount: 10.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: TRAVIS D WATSON; Receipt Number: 7786875

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • FinancialDate: 11/14/2018; Amount: 400.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: TRAVIS D WATSON; Receipt Number: 7779926

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less