This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 09/22/2022 at 20:02:16 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY vs. LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORES, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS COUNTRY STORES, INC. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRANDON J RAFOOL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRANDON J RAFOOL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

MBA TRUCKING LLC,

Defendant

LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORES, INC.

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON STEVEN J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - STREAMLINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED LOVES TRAVEL STOPS AND COUNTRY STORE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialDate: 09/09/2022; Amount: 310.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9313228

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-LOVES TRAVEL STOPS COUNTRY STORES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMAPNY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacobson, Steven J, ESQ.