This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 00:46:29 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY vs. WILSON HOMER J

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILSON HOMER J. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O JONATHAN BEAULIEU

Defendants

WILSON HOMER J

206 Esperanza Rd

Auburndale, FL 33823

BIRCHFIELD HUGH ALLEN

Kissimmee, FL 34758-

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

04/10/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED HUGH ALLEN BIRCHFIELD

10/24/2018: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED HUGH ALLEN BIRCHFIELD

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / HUGH ALLEN BIRCHFIELD

10/12/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / HUGH ALLEN BIRCHFIELD

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

10/11/2018: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COMPLAINT

10/11/2018: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/11/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • DispositionParty: HUGH ALLEN BIRCHFIELD; Disposition Code: DFLT; Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Date: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DispositionParty: HOMER J WILSON; Disposition Code: DFLT; Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Date: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • HearingCourt Date: 10/07/2019; Court Time: 1:15 PM; Location: BARTOW HRG RM 8B1 RED ELEVATOR; Motion: MOT_FINAL_JUDG - MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGEMENT; Section: 07; Judge: CATHERINE L COMBEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketReason: MOT_FINAL_JUDG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/07/2019 01:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - HOMER J WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED HUGH ALLEN BIRCHFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • FinancialDate: 10/12/2018; Amount: 420.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: RALPH MARCADIS ESQUIRE; Receipt Number: 7747524

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / HUGH ALLEN BIRCHFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / HOMER J WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less