This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/12/2023 at 17:43:56 (UTC).

PRO MED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC vs. NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 PRO MED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT G FEGERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT G FEGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRO MED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC

Defendant

NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE

C/O Corporation Service Company R.A., 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

08/18/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE

08/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 05/23/2022; Court Time: 1:15 PM; Location: GENERAL CIVIL VIRTUAL; Motion: CMC - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Section: M0; Judge: ROBERT G FEGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DispositionParty: NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE; Disposition Code: DSBH; Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Date: 05/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - STREAMLINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketReason: CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 05/23/2022 01:15 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC'S ANSWER / RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialDate: 08/26/2021; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: GASDICK STANTON EARLY PA E POR; Receipt Number: 8835855

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less