This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 11/13/2021 at 18:29:35 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC vs. MCCLELLAN JAMES M

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MCCLELLAN JAMES M. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GERALD P HILL II and DANA Y MOORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GERALD P HILL II

DANA Y MOORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

Lakeland, FL 33810

MCCLELLAN, JAMES M

Lakeland, FL 33810

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

Lakeland, FL 33810

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES M MCCLELLAN

Lakeland, FL 33810

MCCLELLAN, LEIGH ANN A

Lakeland, FL 33810

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS SARA

225 E Robinson St, Suite 155

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/06/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - JAMES M MCCLELLAN

08/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - JAMES M MCCLELLAN

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - LEIGH ANN A MCCLELLAN

08/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - LEIGH ANN A MCCLELLAN

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

08/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

08/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES M MCCLELLAN

08/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES M MCCLELLAN

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

08/06/2020: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

01/11/2021: SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE

01/16/2021: NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE

AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION

01/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED PRO SE RESPONSE

09/23/2020: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED PRO SE RESPONSE

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMIN. ORDER 3-29.2

12/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMIN. ORDER 3-29.2

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

02/16/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

CHECK REQUEST TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY

03/11/2021: CHECK REQUEST TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY

COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK

03/18/2021: COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK

COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK

03/18/2021: COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF REQUESTED CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF REQUESTED CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHECK REQUEST TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF BID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - LEIGH ANN A MCCLELLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - JAMES M MCCLELLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PennyMac Loan Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS SARA