Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 20:54:43 (UTC).

PATEL ABOOBAKR vs. LOWREY WILSON

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 PATEL ABOOBAKR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOWREY WILSON. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN L SELPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN L SELPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATEL ABOOBAKR

Orlando, FL 32819

Defendants

WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC

LOWREY WILSON

Plant City, FL 33565

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON GEORGE H III

7335 West Sand Lake Road Ste 300

Orlando, FL 32819

Defendant Attorney

KELLY ROBERT P

Po Box 7217

London, KY 40742

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC

01/27/2021: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS/INTERROGATORIES

01/20/2021: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS/INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

12/22/2020: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/22/2020: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC BY SERVING RONNIE LONG

12/04/2020: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC BY SERVING RONNIE LONG

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/WESCO DISTRIBUTUIB UBC

11/13/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/WESCO DISTRIBUTUIB UBC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/WILSON LOWREY

11/13/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/WILSON LOWREY

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC

11/12/2020: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT WILSON LOWREY

11/12/2020: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT WILSON LOWREY

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC

11/12/2020: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT WILSON LOWREY

11/12/2020: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT WILSON LOWREY

COMPLAINT

11/12/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/12/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS/INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- WILSON LOWREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC BY SERVING RONNIE LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • FinancialDate: 11/13/2020; Amount: 420.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: DAN NEWLIN PA; Receipt Number: 8519417

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/WESCO DISTRIBUTUIB UBC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/WILSON LOWREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT WILSON LOWREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT WILSON LOWREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT P KELLY