This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 02/04/2020 at 15:59:38 (UTC).

PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs. CALDERON CARLOS E

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CALDERON CARLOS E. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD P HILL II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GERALD P HILL II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

C/O Robert J. Watson, Jr., Esq., Post Office Box 3146

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant

CALDERON CARLOS E

Kissimmee, FL 34747-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON ROBERT J JR

Post Office Box 3146

Orlando, FL 32802

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ACCEPTANCE OF GARNISHEE DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC ANSWER AND MOTION FOR

08/14/2019: PLAINTIFFS ACCEPTANCE OF GARNISHEE DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC ANSWER AND MOTION FOR

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC

08/05/2019: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC

EXECUTION

12/27/2018: EXECUTION

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR MEETING

07/12/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR MEETING

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED / CARLOS E CALDERON

06/29/2018: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED / CARLOS E CALDERON

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / CARLOS E CALDERON

05/30/2018: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / CARLOS E CALDERON

SERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - CARLOS E CALDERON

05/03/2018: SERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - CARLOS E CALDERON

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ CARLOS E CALDERON

01/29/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ CARLOS E CALDERON

COMPLAINT

01/26/2018: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

01/26/2018: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/26/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT ON GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS ACCEPTANCE OF GARNISHEE DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC ANSWER AND MOTION FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE - DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN COMPLIANCE WITH F S 77 041(2)- DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT / DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES/DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • FinancialDate: 06/12/2019; Amount: 85.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: DAVID JONES; Receipt Number: 8003038

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES (TO BE ISSUED)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR MEETING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED / CARLOS E CALDERON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • FinancialDate: 05/31/2018; Amount: 10.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: ROBERT J WATSON JR.; Receipt Number: 7606740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / CARLOS E CALDERON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - CARLOS E CALDERON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • FinancialDate: 01/29/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: ROBERT J WATSON JR.; Receipt Number: 7470680

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ CARLOS E CALDERON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Watson, Robert J Jr