This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 19:32:35 (UTC).

PAPADOPOULOS FOTIOS vs. SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 PAPADOPOULOS FOTIOS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN RADABAUGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN RADABAUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAPADOPOULOS FOTIOS

Winter Haven, FL 33884-

Defendant

SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

249 Wilson Avenue

Babson Park, FL 33827

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

COTNEY TRENTON H

3110 Cherry Palm Drive Suite 290

Tampa, FL 33619

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

07/02/2019: ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/22/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

05/07/2019: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER QUASHING SERVICE OF PROCESS VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT STAYING COLLECTION PROCEEDINGS AND

09/25/2018: ORDER QUASHING SERVICE OF PROCESS VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT STAYING COLLECTION PROCEEDINGS AND

NOTICE OF FILING PROPERTY APPRAISERS REPORT

09/12/2018: NOTICE OF FILING PROPERTY APPRAISERS REPORT

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - MIDFLORIDA CREDIT UNION

07/31/2018: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - MIDFLORIDA CREDIT UNION

NOTICE OF FILING CORPORATE REPORT

07/25/2018: NOTICE OF FILING CORPORATE REPORT

EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND STAY FURTHER EXECUTION EFFORTS

07/20/2018: EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND STAY FURTHER EXECUTION EFFORTS

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT STAY COLLECTION PROCEEDINGS AND TO

07/16/2018: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT STAY COLLECTION PROCEEDINGS AND TO

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE MIDFLORIDA CREDIT UNION

07/16/2018: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE MIDFLORIDA CREDIT UNION

MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - MIDFLORIDA CREDIT UNION

07/02/2018: MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - MIDFLORIDA CREDIT UNION

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

06/19/2018: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/19/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - RECEIVED BY JUDGE

06/18/2018: LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - RECEIVED BY JUDGE

CLERK'S DEFAULT - SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

06/11/2018: CLERK'S DEFAULT - SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC BY SERVING SUMMER CLEMONS

06/06/2018: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC BY SERVING SUMMER CLEMONS

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC

05/21/2018: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/21/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • HearingCourt Date: 07/01/2019; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: BARTOW 8 D BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: CASE_MGMT_CONF - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Section: 15; Judge: JOHN RADABAUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketReason: CASE_MGMT_CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 07/01/2019 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketGRANTING IN PART AND ENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER QUASHING SERVICE OF PROCESS VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT STAYING COLLECTION PROCEEDINGS AND

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT - SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRAECIPE FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC BY SERVING SUMMER CLEMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • FinancialDate: 04/30/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: ROBERT KEITH EDDY; Receipt Number: 7571815

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK SIGNATURE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less