This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/25/2021 at 00:16:59 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL INC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TOONEMAI vs. BRIGHTBILL, RHONDA F

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL INC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TOONEMAI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRIGHTBILL, RHONDA F. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HOPE M PATTEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00LK

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HOPE M PATTEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ONEMAIN HOME EQUITY INC,

WILMINGTN TRUST NA,

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL INC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TOONEMAI

P.O. Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

SPRINGLEAF FUNDING TRUST 2015-B,

SPRINGLEAF HOME EQUTY INC,

Defendants

BRIGHTBILL, ROBERT

BRIGHTBILL, RHONDA F

Haines City, FL 33844-6911

BRIGHTBILL, ROBERT S

Haines City, FL 33844-6911

BRIGHTBILL, RHONDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBELLO THOMAS III

P O Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32201

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/18/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 04/26/2021; Court Time: 10:00 AM; Location: LAKELAND VIRTUAL COURTROOM; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: L1; Judge: HOPE M PATTEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE - RHONDA F BRIGHTBILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE - ROBERT S BRIGHTBILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/25/2021; Court Time: 10:00 AM; Location: LAKELAND VIRTUAL COURTROOM; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: L1; Judge: HOPE M PATTEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketTRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 04/26/2021 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • HearingCourt Date: 12/14/2020; Court Time: 10:00 AM; Location: LAKELAND VIRTUAL COURTROOM; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: L1; Judge: HOPE M PATTEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketVIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR - RHONDA F BRIGHTBILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketTRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 01/25/2021 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialDate: 11/19/2020; Amount: 320.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: THOMAS LOBELLO III; Receipt Number: 8525562

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 12/14/2020 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less