This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 02:39:51 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING vs. SNELL STEVEN T

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 NEWREZ LLC DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SNELL STEVEN T. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN L SELPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN L SELPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ LLC DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

225 Robinson Street Suite 660

Orlando, FL 32812

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEVEN T SNELL AKA S.T. SNELL

Winterhaven, FL 33884-

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

Winterhaven, FL 33884-

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

Winterhaven, FL 33884-

HAWAIIAN ASSOCIATION INC

1012 Macon Road

Winterhaven, FL 33884-

SNELL STEVEN T

Winter Haven, FL 33884

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS SARA

225 E Robinson St, Suite 155

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

MERRIWEATHER NICHOLAS P

422 South Florida Ave

Lakeland, FL 33801

 

Court Documents

ENTRY OF DEFAULT ISSUED - STEVEN T SNELL AKA S T SNELL UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEVEN T SNELL AKA S T

01/27/2021: ENTRY OF DEFAULT ISSUED - STEVEN T SNELL AKA S T SNELL UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEVEN T SNELL AKA S T

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEVEN T SNELL AKA ST SNELL

11/25/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEVEN T SNELL AKA ST SNELL

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

11/25/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANAT IN POSSESSION 1

11/25/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANAT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ HAWAIIAN ASSOCIATIO INC

11/25/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ HAWAIIAN ASSOCIATIO INC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/STEVEN T SNELL AKA ST SNELL

11/25/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/STEVEN T SNELL AKA ST SNELL

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

11/23/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

11/23/2020: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

11/23/2020: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/25/2021; Court Time: 10:15 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 08 VIRTUAL; Motion: MOT_SUMM_JUDG - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT; Section: 08; Judge: STEVEN L SELPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketPURSUANT TO RULE 2 516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT HAWAIIAN ASSOCIATION INC AND DESIGNATION OF E MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketReason: MOT_SUMM_JUDG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 03/25/2021 10:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSNELL NKA MICHELLE SNELL AND HAEAIIAN ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DEFAULT ISSUED - STEVEN T SNELL AKA S T SNELL UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEVEN T SNELL AKA S T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCLERK OF COURTS FILING LOCATION OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANAT IN POSSESSION 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ HAWAIIAN ASSOCIATIO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/STEVEN T SNELL AKA ST SNELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATEION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newrez, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS SARA