This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 06/19/2022 at 22:18:01 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING vs. RODRIGUEZ GUSTAVO

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ GUSTAVO. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D SITES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D SITES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

2101 Ne 26Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33305

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ GUSTAVO

Kissimmee, FL 34759

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Kissimmee, FL 34759

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Kissimmee, FL 34759

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GUSTAVO RODRIGUEZ

Kissimmee, FL 34759

ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC

401 Walnut St

Poinciana, FL 34759

AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCE

C/O Ct Corporation System, 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

STATE OF FLORIDA

2450 Shumard Oak Blvd Blgd 1 Floor 2

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELUCA ORLANDO

2101 Ne 26Th St

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33305

 

Court Documents

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

04/20/2022: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

04/20/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

04/20/2022: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCE

04/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialDate: 05/06/2022; Amount: 18.50; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9149684

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DispositionParty: STATE OF FLORIDA; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DispositionParty: AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCE; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DispositionParty: ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GUSTAVO RODRIGUEZ; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN TENANT #2; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN TENANT #1; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DispositionParty: GUSTAVO RODRIGUEZ; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GUSTAVO RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ GUSTAVO RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC SBM is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Newrez, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant