This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 22:10:26 (UTC).

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-1 vs. OLIVARES MARIA E

Case Summary

On 01/03/2018 NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-1 filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLIVARES MARIA E. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD P HILL II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GERALD P HILL II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-1

7765 Sw 87Th Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant

OLIVARES MARIA E

Lake Wales, FL 33859-

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING - NON NEGOTIABLE AGREEMENT

02/21/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - NON NEGOTIABLE AGREEMENT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

01/03/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DispositionParty: MARIA E OLIVARES; Disposition Code: DBHS; Description: DISM BEF HRG SETTLEMNT; Date: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketSETTLEMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE- RECEIVED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketSETTLEMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY UNDER FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.720(E)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-MARIA E OLIVARES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • FinancialDate: 01/04/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: JASON SCOTT DRAGUTSKY; Receipt Number: 7444655

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - MARIA E OLIVARES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketFORM 1.997 CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less