This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 15:03:14 (UTC).

MUSCARNERA MICHELLE M vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 MUSCARNERA MICHELLE M filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD P HILL II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GERALD P HILL II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUSCARNERA MICHELLE M

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Fl Chief Fin. Officer As Registered Agent, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEFAN MANUEL

4495 South Semoran Blvd

Orlando, FL 32822

Defendant Attorneys

TAJAK KRISTEN A

189 South Orange Avenue Suite 1430

Orlando, FL 32801

GALLAGHER MICHAEL J

189 South Orange Ave Suite 1430

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/26/2019: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING OF INTERROGATORIES

12/03/2018: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/03/2018: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

12/03/2018: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY C/O FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL

12/03/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY C/O FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL

COMPLAINT

12/03/2018: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/03/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • HearingCourt Date: 06/04/2020; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: BARTOW HRG RM 8B1 RED ELEVATOR; Motion: PTC - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: 04; Judge: GERALD P HILL II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NON PARTY PRODUCTION SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS QUALIFIED WAIVER OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION TO NON PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION TO NON PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketEXAMINATION OF PERSON DATED 11.20.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED CONDITIONAL OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - RECEIVED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S NORTHUP REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR REPORT OF DEFENDANT'S COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINER

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • FinancialDate: 12/05/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MANUEL STEFAN; Receipt Number: 7800950

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketOFFICER AS REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY C/O FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less