This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/20/2022 at 06:16:49 (UTC).

MUNOZ, DELKIS vs. UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 MUNOZ, DELKIS filed an Other lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN L BARBER and BRANDON J RAFOOL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SUSAN L BARBER

BRANDON J RAFOOL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MUNOZ, DELKIS

MUNOZ, RONNIE

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA DAVID

250 N Orange Avenue Suite 605

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

BLUNDY DANIEL R

3185 South Conway Road Suite E

Orlando, FL 32812-7315

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

10/27/2021: LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING COURTS RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED PER SPECIAL ORDER IN RE: REASSIGNMENT OF COUNTY CIVIL CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • FinancialDate: 11/06/2021; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MICHAEL PAVLOU; Receipt Number: 8918727

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OFDOCU,ENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA DAVID