This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 15:31:28 (UTC).

MOWRY, WARNER KENT

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 MOWRY, WARNER KENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

MOWRY, KENNETH BRIAN

POTTER, AMANDA

PACKARD, PAIGE

Decedent

MOWRY, WARNER KENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION-CLOSES SUMADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketPETITION DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketKENNETH B. MOWRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketCONSENT WAIVER & JOINDER/PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION, PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketPAIGE PACKARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketCONSENT,WAIVER & JOINDER/PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION, PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketPETITION SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION-OPENS SUMADM

    Read MoreRead Less