This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/18/2022 at 04:32:52 (UTC).

MOLD AND MITIGATION PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC vs. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 MOLD AND MITIGATION PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY CATHERINE GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARY CATHERINE GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOLD AND MITIGATION PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC A/A/O KRISTEL FLORES

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

LETTER FROM CLERK

06/10/2021: LETTER FROM CLERK

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/10/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/10/2021: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

LETTER FROM CLERK [UNSIGNED]

06/10/2021: LETTER FROM CLERK [UNSIGNED]

LETTER FROM CLERK OF RECEIVING TRANSFERRED CASE

06/14/2021: LETTER FROM CLERK OF RECEIVING TRANSFERRED CASE

VIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR- AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

06/14/2021: VIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR- AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

06/21/2021: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF HEARING

06/24/2021: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF HEARING

TRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

07/28/2021: TRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

08/06/2021: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DispositionParty: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY; Disposition Code: DSAH; Description: DISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Date: 08/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 07/28/2021; Court Time: 3:30 PM; Location: BARTOW SMALL CLAIMS/EVICTIONS VIRTUAL; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: M2; Judge: MARY CATHERINE GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 07/29/2021 09:45 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDEFENDNANTS NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY AND NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketReason: MOTN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF TRANSACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK [UNSIGNED]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDOCKET SUMMARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketAGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOLD AND MITIGATION OF ORLANDO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where American Integrity Insurance Company is a litigant