This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 01/28/2023 at 10:38:18 (UTC).

MIFLORIDA CREDIT UNION vs. STERLING, GLORIA E

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 MIFLORIDA CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STERLING, GLORIA E. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY CATHERINE GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00LK

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARY CATHERINE GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIFLORIDA CREDIT UNION

P.O. Box 8008

Lakeland, FL 33802

Defendant

STERLING, GLORIA E

Spring Hill, FL 34609

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 01/23/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDate: 11/29/2022; Amount: 310.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MID FLORIDA FCU (LKND); Receipt Number: 9405636

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - GLORIA E STERLING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 01/23/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDFLORIDA CREDIT UNION is a litigant