This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 01/28/2023 at 10:38:02 (UTC).

MIDFLORIDA CREDIT UNION vs. FREEMAN, SANDRA KAY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 MIDFLORIDA CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FREEMAN, SANDRA KAY. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY CATHERINE GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00LK

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARY CATHERINE GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDFLORIDA CREDIT UNION

P.O. Box 8008

Lakeland, FL 33802

Defendant

FREEMAN, SANDRA KAY

Fort Pierce, FL 34982

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SANDRA KAY FREEMAN

11/29/2022: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SANDRA KAY FREEMAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • DispositionParty: SANDRA KAY FREEMAN; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/23/2023; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: LAKELAND GOVERNMENT CENTER; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: L1; Judge: MARY CATHERINE GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketTRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED SANDRA KAY FREEMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED SANDRA KAY FREEMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDate: 11/29/2022; Amount: 310.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MID FLORIDA FCU (LKND); Receipt Number: 9405578

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SANDRA KAY FREEMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 01/23/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDFLORIDA CREDIT UNION is a litigant