This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 12:41:54 (UTC).

MICHAUD ANDRE vs. FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 MICHAUD ANDRE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN RADABAUGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN RADABAUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAUD ANDRE

Winter Haven, FL 33884

BERNIER-MICHAUD NATALIA

Defendant

FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Post Office Box 690

Pinellas Park, FL 33780

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEWART BRADFORD L

5151 S Lakeland Drive Suite 2

Lakeland, FL 33813

Defendant Attorney

MURRAY JESSICA

400 N. Ashley Dr. Ste 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

11/30/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF DEFENDANT FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/30/2018: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF DEFENDANT FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

DEFENDANT FLORIDA SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR

10/18/2018: DEFENDANT FLORIDA SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR

DEFENDANT FLORIDA SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND

10/08/2018: DEFENDANT FLORIDA SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS- SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE

09/25/2018: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS- SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

09/12/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

09/11/2018: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT FLORIDFA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 12/16/2019 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 03/03/2020 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE FOR MANDATORY STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS- SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • FinancialDate: 09/12/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: THE NATION LAW FIRM; Receipt Number: 7715967

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less