This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/20/2021 at 12:06:05 (UTC).

MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC., AN ILLINOIS vs. MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A DELAWARE LIMITED

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC , AN ILLINOIS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A DELAWARE LIMITED. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANA Y MOORE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANA Y MOORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (COUNTER)

MEDLINE INDUSTRIES INC AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (THIRD PARTY)

Defendants

SAVAGE BROTHERS, INC. (THIRD PARTY)

KIMLEY-HORN AND ASSOCIATES, INC (THIRD PARTY)

GEMCO CONSTRUCTORS LLC (THIRD PARTY)

WARE MALCOMB, INC.(THIRD PARTY)

GENESIS ENGINEERING GROUP, INC (THIRD PARTY)

C/O Registered Agent Ct Corporation System, 1200 South Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324-

MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

C/O Ct Corporation, 1200 South Pine Island Road

Tallahassee, FL 33324

MEDLINE INDUSTRIES INC AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION (COUNTER)

FULL-TILT CONSTRUCTORS, INC. (THIRD PARTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEON ALEXANDER G

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

KNIGHT RYAN G

800 N Magnolia Ave., Ste. 430

Orlando, FL 32803

BUFFINGTON AMANDA B

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd., Ste. 300

Tampa, FL 33607

GUSTAFSON JR ALAN P

1410 N Westshore Blvd, Suite 200

Tampa, FL 33607

KRESS DOUGLAS J

11410 North Jog Road Suite 100

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418

ARNOLD TREVOR

301 E Pine St Ste 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

GARRISON MARK H

6300 University Parkway Ste 101

Sarasota, FL 34240

 

Court Documents

THIRD PARTUY SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - GENESIS ENGINEERING GROUP INC

02/05/2021: THIRD PARTUY SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - GENESIS ENGINEERING GROUP INC

THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT/PLAINTIFF GEMCO CONSTRUCTORS LLCS THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

12/17/2020: THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT/PLAINTIFF GEMCO CONSTRUCTORS LLCS THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT FULL TILT CONSTRUCTORS INCS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANT/

12/09/2020: THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT FULL TILT CONSTRUCTORS INCS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANT/

NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

12/07/2020: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/07/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/30/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/30/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/30/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SAVAGE BROTHERS INCS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/24/2020: SAVAGE BROTHERS INCS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

MEDLINE INDUSTRIES INCS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLCS

11/23/2020: MEDLINE INDUSTRIES INCS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLCS

THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLCS NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-

11/19/2020: THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLCS NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - ON THIRD-PART COMPLAINT - GEMCO CONSTRUCITON LLC

11/09/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - ON THIRD-PART COMPLAINT - GEMCO CONSTRUCITON LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - ON THIRD-PART COMPLAINT - FULL-TILT CONSTRUCTORS, INC

11/09/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - ON THIRD-PART COMPLAINT - FULL-TILT CONSTRUCTORS, INC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - ON THIRD-PART COMPLAINT - WARE MALCOMB, INC.

11/09/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - ON THIRD-PART COMPLAINT - WARE MALCOMB, INC.

LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

10/30/2020: LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

SUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

10/28/2020: SUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

LETTER FROM CLERK

10/16/2020: LETTER FROM CLERK

EXHIBIT A

10/12/2020: EXHIBIT A

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 02/09/2021; Court Time: 9:15 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 04 VIRTUAL; Motion: MOT_STRIKE - MOTION TO STRIKE; Section: 04; Judge: DANA Y MOORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAGREED ORDER GRANTING MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialDate: 02/05/2021; Amount: 10.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD BOYER; Receipt Number: 8602861

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTUY SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - GENESIS ENGINEERING GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketReason: MOT_STRIKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 02/09/2021 09:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLCS THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • FinancialDate: 07/30/2020; Amount: 10.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: PAULA DI VEROLI AND BILZIN SUM; Receipt Number: 8414954

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialDate: 07/28/2020; Amount: 400.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: PAULA DI VEROLI AND BILZIN SUM; Receipt Number: 8412704

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KIMLEY-HORN AND ASSOCIATES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDLINE INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant