This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/17/2022 at 16:45:40 (UTC).

MEDINA ERIKA vs. PADILLA MIGUEL

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 MEDINA ERIKA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PADILLA MIGUEL. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDINA, ERIKA

Defendants

PADILLA, MIGUEL

Moreno Valley, CA 92553

DIAMOND TRUCKING CO LLC

15418 Buchanan Ln

Fontana, CA 92336

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEAKLEY JUSTIN M

903 N Main St

Kissimmee, FL 34744

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

05/18/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - MIGUEL PADILLA

05/20/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - MIGUEL PADILLA

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - DIAMOND TRUCKING CO LLC

05/20/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - DIAMOND TRUCKING CO LLC

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/18/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

05/18/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIM OF MENTAL ANGUISH

05/21/2021: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIM OF MENTAL ANGUISH

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • DispositionParty: DIAMOND TRUCKING CO LLC; Disposition Code: DBHS; Description: DISM BEF HRG SETTLEMNT; Date: 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DispositionParty: MIGUEL PADILLA; Disposition Code: DBHS; Description: DISM BEF HRG SETTLEMNT; Date: 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT MIGUEL PADILLAS NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF ERIKA MEDINAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT MIGUEL PADILLAS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ERIKA MEDINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MIGUEL PADILLA AND DIAMOND TRUCKING CO LLC REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - MIGUEL PADILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diamond S. Trucking is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLEAKLEY, JUSTIN M