This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 12/04/2021 at 22:07:19 (UTC).

MEADE THOMAS vs. FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 MEADE THOMAS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEADE, THOMAS

Defendant

FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA DAVID

250 N Orange Avenue Suite 605

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

FREEMAN BRET L

400 N Ashley Drive Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • FinancialDate: 10/11/2021; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MICHAEL PAVLOU; Receipt Number: 8887838

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA DAVID