Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 02:45:59 (UTC).

MCCOY THERESA vs. WOODHILL ESTATES LLC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 MCCOY THERESA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WOODHILL ESTATES LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GERALD P HILL II and DANA Y MOORE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GERALD P HILL II

DANA Y MOORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCOY THERESA

Lakeland, FL 33803

Defendant

WOODHILL ESTATES LLC

C/O Frank Skelly, 218 Us Hwy 1 Ste 101

Tequesta, FL 33469

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KEMP ADAM

2012 S Florida Ave

Lakeland, FL 33803

WRIGHT JOSHUA D

201 N Franklin St., 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

FISHER ELIZABETH B ESQUIRE

2203 North Lois Avenue Suite 707

Tampa, FL 33607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT (ATTACHED EXHIBIT A-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE FOR TRIAL AND REQUEST TO DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketTHERESA MCCOY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT WOODHILL ESTATES LLC FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT WOODHILL ESTATES LLC FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF THERESA MCCOY

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - WOODHILL ESTATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialDate: 10/29/2020; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MORGAN AND MORGAN TAMPA PA; Receipt Number: 8502931

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/WOODHILL ESTATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH BENTON FISHER