This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/10/2023 at 18:50:54 (UTC).

MCCLURE KALVIN vs. FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 MCCLURE KALVIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P MCDANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL P MCDANIEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCLURE, KALVIN

Defendant

FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC FKA VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GACIO TOMAS-PHILLIP

Defendant Attorney

MERCER DAVID A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/27/2022: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT PUBLIX SUPERMARKETS INC

12/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT PUBLIX SUPERMARKETS INC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

12/27/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

12/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

12/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON FLORIDA LLC (AMENDED AS TO

01/04/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON FLORIDA LLC (AMENDED AS TO

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC (A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) FKA VERIZON

01/17/2023: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC (A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) FKA VERIZON

NOTICE OF APPEARNACE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/27/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARNACE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/27/2023: ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSETO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DATED JANUARY 27 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAITNIFF KALVIN MCCLURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARNACE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketFLORIDA LLC CO CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY AS REGISTERED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC (A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) FKA VERIZON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCORRECT NAME OF DEFENDANT ONLY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON FLORIDA LLC (AMENDED AS TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialDate: 12/28/2022; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9441154

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC FKA VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT PUBLIX SUPERMARKETS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less