This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/19/2022 at 23:24:28 (UTC).

MAYS ANGELA vs. SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 MAYS ANGELA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES A YANCEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES A YANCEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAYS, ANGELA

CLEMONS MARK ANTONIO

Defendant

SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN COMPANY AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA

Cfo 200 E Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSO CHRISTOPHER D

1135 Lakeland Hills Blvd

Lakeland, FL 33805

Defendant Attorney

JONES GREGORY D

302 Knights Run Avenue Suite 1000

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

10/06/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

10/05/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

10/05/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

10/05/2021: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

10/05/2021: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

10/18/2021: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialDate: 10/06/2021; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: CHRISTOPHER D RUSSO; Receipt Number: 8882409

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSSO CHRISTOPHER D