This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 15:56:44 (UTC).

MANG, TONI LYNN

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 MANG, TONI LYNN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

ACKERSON, MARK EDWARD

DUNAGAN, TERRY

Interested Party

TURNER, VINCE E

Decedent

MANG, TONI LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

TURNER VINCE E

Po Box 7122

Winter Haven, FL 33883

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/18/2019 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketReason: CASE_MGMT_CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/18/2019 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - 10/18/2019, 10:00AM, 6B1, STARGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM- WELLS FARGO BANK $5,271.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • DocketOBJECTION TO CLAIM - BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE / CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less