This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 19:45:24 (UTC).

MACEDO MARIA VITORIA vs. ESQUIVEL EMILIO ANDRES

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 MACEDO MARIA VITORIA filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against ESQUIVEL EMILIO ANDRES. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES A YANCEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES A YANCEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MACEDO MARIA VITORIA

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Defendant

ESQUIVEL EMILIO ANDRES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketFLORIDA ADDENDUM TO INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketORDER INCOME DEDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketFINAL ORDER ON CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT EMILIO ANDRES ESQUIVEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 01/29/2019 01:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketReason: NEW COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED / EMILIO ANDRES ESQUIVEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FINANCIAL MARIA MACEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less