Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 03/31/2021 at 20:10:56 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. RAMOS, GRISELL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAMOS, GRISELL. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN M KOHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN M KOHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

P.O. Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

Defendant

RAMOS, GRISELL

Davenport, FL 33837-9559

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR HAROLD E

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

Defendant Attorney

CASTELLANOS J NICHOLAS

3639 Cortez Rd., West, Ste. 130

Bradenton, FL 34210

 

Court Documents

VIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR- GRISELL RAMOS

03/18/2021: VIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR- GRISELL RAMOS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/17/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 04/28/2021; Court Time: 2:30 PM; Location: BARTOW SMALL CLAIMS/EVICTIONS VIRTUAL; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: M2; Judge: KEVIN M KOHL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR- GRISELL RAMOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialDate: 03/17/2021; Amount: 185.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: ABC LEGAL SERVICES LLC; Receipt Number: 8647379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 04/28/2021 02:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTELLANOS , J NICHOLAS