This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 19:01:44 (UTC).

LUMPKIN DORIS ARIZONA vs. TAYLOR SEAN MORGAN-FREEMAN

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 LUMPKIN DORIS ARIZONA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TAYLOR SEAN MORGAN-FREEMAN. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00WH

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUMPKIN DORIS ARIZONA

Defendant

TAYLOR SEAN MORGAN-FREEMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketREPORT OF MAGISTRATE & NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM SELF HELP PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketReason: FH_DOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 12/11/2018 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketANSWER WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINALJUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS COMPLETION - DORIS A LUMPKIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less