This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 23:02:22 (UTC).

LOPEZ-ORTIZ, JORGE L

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 LOPEZ-ORTIZ, JORGE L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Decedents

LOPEZ-ORTIZ, JORGE L

ORTIZ, JORGE LUIS LOPEZ

Not Yet Classified

PACHECO, GLORIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE-CLOSES FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketWAIVER ACCT./SERVICE PET.DISCH./CONSENT/RECEIPT-GLORIA PACHECO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE / CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less