This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/12/2023 at 19:42:34 (UTC).

GAMBLE JACQUEZ vs. FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 GAMBLE JACQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES A YANCEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES A YANCEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEISHA LIAS AS PARENT AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF JG A MINOR

Defendant

FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

08/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

DEFENDANTS CHARTER COMMUNICATION INC ANSWER AND AFFIMATIVE DEFENSES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS

01/07/2022: DEFENDANTS CHARTER COMMUNICATION INC ANSWER AND AFFIMATIVE DEFENSES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS

COMPLAINT

08/23/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 02/08/2023; Court Time: 10:15 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 08 VIRTUAL; Motion: MOT WITHDRAW -; Section: 08; Judge: JAMES A YANCEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketReason: MOT WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 02/08/2023 10:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DispositionParty: FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC; Disposition Code: OTHR; Description: OTHER; Date: 05/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 04/29/2022 10:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 04/29/2022 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO FROMTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO SPECTRUM COMMUNICATIONS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICE LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- SPECTRUM COMMUNICATIONS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less