**************0000
08/23/2021
Disposed - Other Disposed
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Not Classified By Court
Polk, Florida
JAMES A YANCEY
LAKEISHA LIAS AS PARENT AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF JG A MINOR
FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC
08/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC
08/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET
01/07/2022: DEFENDANTS CHARTER COMMUNICATION INC ANSWER AND AFFIMATIVE DEFENSES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS
08/23/2021: COMPLAINT
HearingCourt Date: 02/08/2023; Court Time: 10:15 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 08 VIRTUAL; Motion: MOT WITHDRAW -; Section: 08; Judge: JAMES A YANCEY
[-] Read LessDocketReason: MOT WITHDRAW
[-] Read LessDocketCalendar entry added for: 02/08/2023 10:15 AM
[-] Read LessDocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF
[-] Read LessDispositionParty: FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC; Disposition Code: OTHR; Description: OTHER; Date: 05/10/2022
[-] Read LessDocketCOPY OF ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE
[-] Read LessDocketCalendar entry deleted for: 04/29/2022 10:15 AM
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF HEARING
[-] Read LessDocketCalendar entry deleted for: 04/29/2022 09:00 AM
[-] Read LessDocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO FROMTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES LLC
[-] Read LessDocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES LLC
[-] Read LessDocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO SPECTRUM COMMUNICATIONS LLC
[-] Read LessDocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICE LLC
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- SPECTRUM COMMUNICATIONS LLC
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL COVER SHEET
[-] Read Less