This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 15:50:20 (UTC).

LEWIS, ROBERT FRANKLIN III

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 LEWIS, ROBERT FRANKLIN III was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Interested Parties

LEWIS, ROBERT F 3

KARCHER, CHRISTINE B.

STRANGE, ALISON

Not Yet Classified

PARKER, JANICE L

LYNCH, ELLEN

SIMMONS, NANCY L

Decedent

LEWIS, ROBERT FRANKLIN III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE-CLOSES FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketWAIVER ACCT./SERVICE PET.DISCH./CONSENT/RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING W/ GREEN CARD RECEIPTS ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING CO- PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketPETITION WAIVE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketDOCKET SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less