This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 06/17/2020 at 02:56:58 (UTC).

LEAVENGOOD KENDAL ERIN vs. LEAVENGOOD RYAN AVERY

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 LEAVENGOOD KENDAL ERIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LEAVENGOOD RYAN AVERY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00WH

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEAVENGOOD KENDAL ERIN

Defendant

LEAVENGOOD RYAN AVERY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketORDER TO CLARIFY INSURANCE BENEFICIARY PURSUANT TO REPORT OF MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketREPORT OF MAGISTRATE & NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketReason: JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 05/28/2020 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 03/24/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketReason: JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FINANCIAL KENDAL LEAVENGOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less