This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 23:45:17 (UTC).

LAUTERS TONI MICHELLE vs. LAUTERS ROBERT CHARLES

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 LAUTERS TONI MICHELLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LAUTERS ROBERT CHARLES. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAUTERS TONI MICHELLE

Defendant

LAUTERS ROBERT CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIEFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketReason: SDMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 09/26/2018 08:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FINANCIAL - TONI MICHELLE LAUTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FINANCIAL - ROBERT CHARLES LAUTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF RESIDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SIMPLIFIED DIVORCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less