This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 19:47:51 (UTC).

LASALLE ELIEZER vs. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBI

Case Summary

On 03/19/2018 LASALLE ELIEZER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBI. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LASALLE, ELIEZER

Defendant

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER TMASDW202817

Tallahassee, FL 32302

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY

03/20/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

03/19/2018: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2018
  • DispositionParty: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER TMASDW202817; Disposition Code: DBHS; Description: DISM BEF HRG SETTLEMNT; Date: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketAGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketDISCOVERY PENDING COMPLETION OF APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketUNDERWRITERS MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL AND TO STAY AND/OR ABATE PLAINTIFFS LAWSUIT INCLUDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • FinancialDate: 03/20/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: PAUL T ZENIEWICZ; Receipt Number: 7526323

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less