This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 12:18:31 (UTC).

LANDRY NANCY JEAN vs. LANDRY LAWRENCE J SR

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 LANDRY NANCY JEAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LANDRY LAWRENCE J SR. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDRY NANCY JEAN

Defendant

LANDRY LAWRENCE J SR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS COMPLETION- NANCEY J LANDRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketREPORT OF MAGISTRATE & NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS COMPLETION- LAWRENCE LANDRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketReason: FH_DOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 05/02/2018 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FINANCIAL - NANCY JEAN LANDRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCLERK'S DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less